PA HB89 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 3, 1947 (P.L.1242, No.507), entitled "An act relating to police and firemen's pension funds in cities of the second class A, and directing such cities to appropriate certain moneys thereto, and requiring reports and audits," further providing for credit for military service.
Title
Amending the act of July 3, 1947 (P.L.1242, No.507), entitled "An act relating to police and firemen's pension funds in cities of the second class A, and directing such cities to appropriate certain moneys thereto, and requiring reports and audits," further providing for credit for military service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-09-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-06-19 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2012-06-19 | House | First consideration |
2012-06-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-01-19 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |