PA HB885 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 86
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 86
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 20, 1967 (P.L.869, No.385), known as the Public Works Contractors' Bond Law of 1967, further providing for duty of prime contractor to provide financial security in certain contracts involving public works and public improvements.
Title
Further providing for duty of prime contractor to provide financial security in certain contracts involving public works and public improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 885 PN 4075, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A06269 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 885 PN 1497, FP (Y: 198 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00641 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A06269 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 885 PN 1497, FP (Y: 198 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00641 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Senate | Act No. 86 |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-09-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-07-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-07-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-3) |
2020-07-07 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2020-03-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-03-25 | House | Second consideration |
2020-03-25 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-10 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-17 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |