PA HB881 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-29 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: Senate Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-29 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: Senate Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for dogs pursuing, injuring or killing big game.
Title
Further providing for dogs pursuing, injuring or killing big game.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - House - HB 881 PN 3478, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2012-05-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-05-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2012-05-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-05-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-05-09 | House | Second consideration |
2012-05-08 | House | Removed from table |
2012-05-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-05-07 | House | First consideration |
2012-05-07 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-03-02 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |