PA HB881 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-9)
Status: Enrolled on July 3 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 26
Status: Enrolled on July 3 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 26
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for killing game or wildlife to protect property, for provisions relating to unlawful devices and methods and for exceptions to unlawful use of lights while hunting.
Title
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for killing game or wildlife to protect property, for provisions relating to unlawful devices and methods and for exceptions to unlawful use of lights while hunting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-07-03 | Approved by the Governor | |
2007-07-03 | Presented to the Governor | |
2007-07-03 | Signed in Senate | |
2007-07-02 | Signed in House | |
2007-07-02 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2007-06-30 | Reported as committed | |
2007-06-28 | Referred to RULES | |
2007-06-27 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-06-25 | Second consideration | |
2007-06-19 | First consideration | |
2007-06-19 | Reported as amended | |
2007-05-23 | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES | |
2007-05-21 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-05-21 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-05-08 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-05-08 | Second consideration | |
2007-04-30 | Removed from table | |
2007-04-25 | Laid on the table | |
2007-04-25 | First consideration | |
2007-04-25 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-22 | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=881 |