PA HB88 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Act No. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a portion of State Route 309 North in Lynn Township, Lehigh County, between the intersections of Northwest Road and Long Court and Mosserville Road and Mountain Road, as the Lance Corporal Brandon J. Van Parys Memorial Road; designating a portion of State Route 2014 in Lycoming County as the Petty Officer Thomas Johnson Memorial Highway; designating a portion of State Route 61 in Schuylkill County, from State Route 443 to State Route 2014, as the Captain Jason B. Jones Memorial Highway; designating a portion of State Route 254 in Northumberland County as the Staff Sergeant Thomas Allen Baysore Memorial Highway; designating the portion of State Route 443 within the municipal boundaries of Orwigsburg Borough, Schuylkill County, as the Corporal David F. Heiser Memorial Highway; designating a portion of State Route 15 in Lycoming County as the Kelly Rae Mertes DUI Awareness Memorial Highway; designating a portion of State Route 153 from segment 80 to segment 310 in Clearfield County as the Austin M. Harrier Memorial Highway; designating a portion of State Route 422 in Lebanon County as the Officer Michael H. Wise II Memorial Highway; designating Exit 26 from the Mon-Fayette Expressway in Luzerne Township, Fayette County, as the Ronald F. DeSalvo Memorial Interchange; designating a portion of Davisville Road in Upper Moreland Township, Montgomery County, from State Route 611, also known as York Road, to Terwood Road as the PFC Robert S. Alexander Memorial Highway; and designating a portion of State Route 22/322 in Juniata County as the Honorable Daniel F. Clark Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a portion of State Route 309 North in Lynn Township, Lehigh County, between the intersections of Northwest Road and Long Court and Mosserville Road and Mountain Road, as the Lance Corporal Brandon J. Van Parys Memorial Road; designating a portion of State Route 2014 in Lycoming County as the Petty Officer Thomas Johnson Memorial Highway; designating a portion of State Route 61 in Schuylkill County, from State Route 443 to State Route 2014, as the Captain Jason B. Jones Memorial Highway; designating a portion of State Route 254 in Northumberland County as the Staff Sergeant Thomas Allen Baysore Memorial Highway; designating the portion of State Route 443 within the municipal boundaries of Orwigsburg Borough, Schuylkill County, as the Corporal David F. Heiser Memorial Highway; designating a portion of State Route 15 in Lycoming County as the Kelly Rae Mertes DUI Awareness Memorial Highway; designating a portion of State Route 153 from segment 80 to segment 310 in Clearfield County as the Austin M. Harrier Memorial Highway; designating a portion of State Route 422 in Lebanon County as the Officer Michael H. Wise II Memorial Highway; designating Exit 26 from the Mon-Fayette Expressway in Luzerne Township, Fayette County, as the Ronald F. DeSalvo Memorial Interchange; designating a portion of Davisville Road in Upper Moreland Township, Montgomery County, from State Route 611, also known as York Road, to Terwood Road as the PFC Robert S. Alexander Memorial Highway; and designating a portion of State Route 22/322 in Juniata County as the Honorable Daniel F. Clark Memorial Highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-30 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 88 PN 2000, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 88 PN 2000, CONCUR (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Floor: HB 88 PN 78, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-10HouseAct No. 21
2015-07-10HouseApproved by the Governor
2015-06-30HousePresented to the Governor
2015-06-30HouseSigned in Senate
2015-06-30HouseSigned in House
2015-06-30HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (195-0)
2015-06-30HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2015-06-30HouseReferred to RULES
2015-06-30HouseIn the House
2015-06-30SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2015-06-30SenateAmended on third consideration
2015-06-29SenateSecond consideration
2015-06-26SenateFirst consideration
2015-06-26SenateReported as committed
2015-04-08SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2015-03-31SenateIn the Senate
2015-03-31HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-0)
2015-02-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2015-02-10HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2015-02-10HouseSecond consideration
2015-02-09HouseRemoved from table
2015-02-03HouseLaid on the table
2015-02-03HouseFirst consideration
2015-02-03HouseReported as committed
2015-01-21HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2015&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=88
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0088&pn=0078
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0088&pn=2000
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=06/26/2015&rNbr=338
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=02/03/2015&rNbr=18
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/11/2015&rNbr=62
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=142
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=610
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=215
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/30/2015&rNbr=846
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=02/03/2015&RollCallId=18
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/11/2015&RollCallId=62
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=06/26/2015&RollCallId=338
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/30/2015&RollCallId=846

Bill Comments 750

feedback