PA HB88 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-8)
Status: Passed on November 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-01 - Act No. 80
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rights and immunities, further providing for leaves of absence for certain government employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In rights and immunities, further providing for leaves of absence for certain government employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-10-23 - Senate - HB 88 PN 529, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-01 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - HB 88 PN 529, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - HB 88 PN 66, 2013 A11, MILLER (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-11-01SenateAct No. 80
2013-11-01SenateApproved by the Governor
2013-10-24SenatePresented to the Governor
2013-10-23SenateSigned in Senate
2013-10-23SenateSigned in House
2013-10-23SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2013-10-02SenateSecond consideration
2013-10-01SenateFirst consideration
2013-10-01SenateReported as committed
2013-02-08SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2013-02-06SenateIn the Senate
2013-02-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-0)
2013-02-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2013-02-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2013-02-04HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2013-01-22HouseRemoved from table
2013-01-16HouseLaid on the table
2013-01-16HouseFirst consideration
2013-01-16HouseReported as committed
2013-01-10HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2013&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=88
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0088&pn=0066
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0088&pn=0529
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0088&pn=0066
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0088&pn=0529
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2013&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=24
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2013&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=43
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2013&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=10/01/2013&rNbr=473
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2013&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=298

Bill Comments 750

feedback