PA HB878 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in emergency COVID-19 response, establishing the County Block Grant - Entertainment Venue Industry Recovery Program.
Title
In emergency COVID-19 response, establishing the County Block Grant - Entertainment Venue Industry Recovery Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-25 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-05 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |