PA HB875 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 106 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 106 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in dissolution of marital status, further providing for decree of court.
Title
In dissolution of marital status, further providing for decree of court.
Sponsors
Rep. Rich Irvin [R] | Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R] | Rep. Francis Ryan [R] | Rep. Louis Schmitt [R] |
Rep. Perry Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 875 PN 2904, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 875 PN 2904, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03719 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 875 PN 2904, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03719 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | Senate | Act No. 106 of 2022 |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-10-25 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-10-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2022-04-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-04-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-04-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-13 | House | Second consideration |
2022-04-12 | House | Removed from table |
2022-03-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-03-30 | House | First consideration |
2022-03-30 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |