PA HB866 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of State Route 15 in Lycoming County as the Kelly Rae Mertes DUI Awareness Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating a portion of State Route 15 in Lycoming County as the Kelly Rae Mertes DUI Awareness Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Floor: HB 866 PN 1199, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00512 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00512 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Floor: HB 866 PN 1199, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00512 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00512 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-06-16 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2015-05-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-05-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2015-05-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-04-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-04-22 | House | Second consideration |
2015-04-21 | House | Removed from table |
2015-04-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-04-14 | House | First consideration |
2015-04-14 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |