PA HB864 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on October 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-17 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 19, 1988 (P.L.1262, No.156), known as the Local Option Small Games of Chance Act, in preliminary provisions, further providing for legislative intent and for definitions; in games of chance, further providing for prohibition regarding pools, for prize limits and for major league sports drawing, providing for airport 50/50 drawing and further providing for licensing of eligible organizations; in club licensees, further providing for club licensee and for distribution of proceeds; in enforcement, further providing for enforcement; and, in tavern gaming, further providing for licenses, for application, for enforcement and for prohibition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for legislative intent and for definitions; in games of chance, further providing for prohibition regarding pools, for prize limits and for major league sports drawing, providing for airport 50/50 drawing and further providing for licensing of eligible organizations; in club licensees, further providing for club licensee and for distribution of proceeds; in enforcement, further providing for enforcement; and, in tavern gaming, further providing for licenses, for application, for enforcement and for prohibition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 864 PN 4303, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 864 PN 3801, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 864 PN 3801, REVERT TO PRIOR PRINTER'S NUMBER 3433 (Y: 23 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 864 PN 3433, A8875, ALLOWAY AMENDMENT NO. A-8875 (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 864 PN 1984, FP (Y: 136 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 864 PN 1984, 2017 A1870, MOUL (Y: 174 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 864 PN 1984, 2017 A1870, SUSP RULES, MOUL (Y: 174 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 864 PN 1984, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, REED (Y: 169 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 864 PN 970, 2017 A1474, PETRARCA (Y: 154 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 864 PN 970, 2017 A1695, MUSTIO (Y: 65 N: 122 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-17HouseReferred to RULES
2018-10-17HouseIn the House
2018-10-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (42-7)
2018-10-17SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-10-03SenateRemoved from table
2018-10-03SenateLaid on the table
2018-10-02SenateMotion to revert to Printer's No. 3433, Adopted
2018-10-02SenateMotion to revert to Printer's No. 3433 made June 22, 2018, reconsidered
2018-10-01SenateVote on third consideration reconsidered
2018-06-22SenateVote by which this bill was defeated on final passage, reconsidered
2018-06-22SenateThird consideration and defeated on final passage (20-29)
2018-06-22SenateMotion to revert to Prior Printer's No. 3433 (23-26)
2018-06-21SenateAmended on third consideration (26-23)
2018-06-19SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-06-18SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-18SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-12SenateRemoved from table
2018-06-12SenateLaid on the table
2018-04-24SenateFirst consideration
2018-04-24SenateReported as amended
2017-06-16SenateReferred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
2017-06-13SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-13HouseFinal passage (136-56)
2017-06-13HouseThird consideration, with amendments
2017-06-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-12HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-05-24HouseRemoved from table
2017-04-25HouseLaid on the table
2017-04-25HouseFirst consideration
2017-04-25HouseReported as committed
2017-03-16HouseReferred to GAMING OVERSIGHT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=864
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0864&pn=0970
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0864&pn=1984
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0864&pn=2009
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0864&pn=3433
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0864&pn=3801
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0864&pn=4303
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=54&theDate=04/25/2017&RollCallId=299
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=465
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=466
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=487
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=488
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=489
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=490
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=587
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=31&theDate=04/24/2018&RollCallId=808
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/19/2018&RollCallId=994
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=580
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=610
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=611
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=757

Bill Comments

feedback