PA HB860 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-7)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act regulating certain smoke alarms; providing for dwelling unit owner and tenant responsibilities; and prescribing penalties.
Title
Regulating certain smoke alarms; providing for dwelling unit owner and tenant responsibilities; and prescribing penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House Floor: HB 860 PN 848, 2021 A2938 (Y: 197 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House Floor: HB 860 PN 848, 2021 A2525 (Y: 177 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House Floor: HB 860 PN 848, 2021 A2938 (Y: 197 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House Floor: HB 860 PN 848, 2021 A2525 (Y: 177 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-20 | House | Removed from table |
2022-09-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-03-30 | House | Removed from table |
2022-03-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-12-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-11-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-11-16 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-10-04 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-14 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |