PA HB850 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on November 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-03 - Act No. 129
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of September 2, 1965 (P.L.490, No.249), referred to as the Money Transmission Business Licensing Law, further providing for title of act, for definitions, for license required and for exemptions; repealing provisions relating to partial exemption; further providing for qualifications for a license, for application for license, for fee, financial statement and security, for investigation issuance of license, for term of license, for renewal of licenses and for authority of the Department of Banking; providing for suspension, revocation or refusal and for licensee requirements; further providing for agents and subagents; repealing provisions relating to hearing and appeal, injunctions, rules and regulations and examinations by the Secretary of Banking; and further providing for penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for title of act, for definitions, for license required and for exemptions; repealing provisions relating to partial exemption; further providing for qualifications for a license, for application for license, for fee, financial statement and security, for investigation issuance of license, for term of license, for renewal of licenses and for authority of the Department of Banking; providing for suspension, revocation or refusal and for licensee requirements; further providing for agents and subagents; repealing provisions relating to hearing and appeal, injunctions, rules and regulations and examinations by the Secretary of Banking; and further providing for penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-10-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 850 PN 3932, CONCUR (Y: 185 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 850 PN 3932, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 850 PN 3461, FP (Y: 193 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A07417 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-03HouseAct No. 129
2016-11-03HouseApproved by the Governor
2016-10-27HousePresented to the Governor
2016-10-26HouseSigned in Senate
2016-10-26HouseSigned in House
2016-10-26HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (185-5)
2016-10-26HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2016-10-25HouseReferred to RULES
2016-10-25HouseIn the House
2016-10-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2016-10-19SenateSecond consideration
2016-10-18SenateRe-reported as committed
2016-10-17SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2016-09-27SenateFirst consideration
2016-09-27SenateReported as amended
2016-06-20SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2016-06-14SenateIn the Senate
2016-06-14HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-2)
2016-06-14HouseRe-reported as committed
2016-06-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2016-06-13HouseSecond consideration
2016-06-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2016-06-07HouseRe-committed to RULES
2016-06-07HouseFirst consideration
2016-06-07HouseReported as amended
2015-03-26HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2015&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=850
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0850&pn=1029
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0850&pn=3461
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0850&pn=3932
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=06/07/2016&RollCallId=1718
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=06/07/2016&RollCallId=1719
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/13/2016&RollCallId=1762
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1485
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/14/2016&RollCallId=1859
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=37&theDate=09/27/2016&RollCallId=1054
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/18/2016&RollCallId=1112
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=733
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1879
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=10/26/2016&RollCallId=2290

Bill Comments

feedback