PA HB845 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for transparency in public employment collective bargaining.
Title
Providing for transparency in public employment collective bargaining.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A03459 (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A03459 (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-07 | House | Removed from table |
2022-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2022-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-25 | House | First consideration |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |