PA HB843 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-10)
Status: Passed on October 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-10-29 - Act No. 113 of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in emergency management services, providing for counterterrorism planning, preparedness and response; in Emergency Management Assistance Compact, providing for construction; and making repeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In emergency management services, providing for counterterrorism planning, preparedness and response; in Emergency Management Assistance Compact, providing for construction; and making repeals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 843 PN 2748, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-10-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-10-08 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 843 PN 2748, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Floor: HB 843 PN 2449, 2023 A3613 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A03262 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A03132 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-10-29SenateAct No. 113 of 2024
2024-10-29SenateApproved by the Governor
2024-10-23SenatePresented to the Governor
2024-10-23SenateSigned in Senate
2024-10-23SenateSigned in House
2024-10-22SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2024-10-09SenateRe-reported as committed
2024-10-09SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2024-10-09SenateSecond consideration
2024-10-08SenateFirst consideration
2024-10-08SenateReported as committed
2024-04-04SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2024-03-20SenateIn the Senate
2024-03-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2024-03-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2024-03-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2024-03-19HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2024-03-18HouseRemoved from table
2023-12-13HouseLaid on the table
2023-12-13HouseFirst consideration
2023-12-13HouseReported as amended
2023-04-28HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2023&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=843
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0843&pn=1046
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0843&pn=2449
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0843&pn=2748
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=0843&pn=2449&aYear=2023&an=03613
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2023/0/HB0843P2748.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2023/0/HB0843P2748.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=12/13/2023&RollCallId=1264
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=12/13/2023&RollCallId=1265
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=12/13/2023&RollCallId=1266
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=883
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=900
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=62&theDate=03/20/2024&RollCallId=1408
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=10/08/2024&RollCallId=1331
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/09/2024&RollCallId=1351
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=711

Bill Comments

feedback