PA HB835 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child protective services, further providing for investigation of reports.
Title
In child protective services, further providing for investigation of reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - House Children And Youth: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A00762 (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A00762 (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-04 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-23 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1499 |
2019-04-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-15 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |