PA HB835 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-06 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-06 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 9, 1976 (P.L.817, No.143), known as the Mental Health Procedures Act, in general provisions, further providing for rights and remedies of persons in treatment.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for rights and remedies of persons in treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 835 PN 917, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2017-06-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2017-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-26 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-06 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-06 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-06 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to HEALTH |