PA HB834 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-10)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 588 over Interstate 376, Chippewa Township, Beaver County, as the TFC Blake T. Coble Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 588 over Interstate 376, Chippewa Township, Beaver County, as the TFC Blake T. Coble Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Floor: HB 834 PN 916, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-05SenateLaid on the table
2017-05-10SenateFirst consideration
2017-05-10SenateReported as committed
2017-05-04SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-04-24SenateIn the Senate
2017-04-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-0)
2017-04-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-04-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-04-19HouseSecond consideration
2017-04-18HouseRemoved from table
2017-03-22HouseLaid on the table
2017-03-22HouseFirst consideration
2017-03-22HouseReported as committed
2017-03-13HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=834
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0834&pn=0916
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=03/22/2017&RollCallId=144
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=220
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/24/2017&RollCallId=279
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=05/10/2017&RollCallId=172

Bill Comments

feedback