PA HB832 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 37135, located on Pennsylvania Route 92 over the Susquehanna River, Falls Township, Wyoming County, as the Falls Veterans Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 37135, located on Pennsylvania Route 92 over the Susquehanna River, Falls Township, Wyoming County, as the Falls Veterans Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 832 PN 814, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Floor: HB 832 PN 814, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01SenateAct No. 18
2021-06-01SenateApproved by the Governor
2021-05-27SenatePresented to the Governor
2021-05-26SenateSigned in House
2021-05-26SenateSigned in Senate
2021-05-26SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2021-05-25SenateSecond consideration
2021-05-24SenateFirst consideration
2021-05-24SenateReported as committed
2021-04-21SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2021-04-20SenateIn the Senate
2021-04-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-04-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-04-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-19HouseSecond consideration
2021-03-24HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-23HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-23HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-23HouseReported as committed
2021-03-08HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=832
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0832&pn=0814
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0832P0814.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=03/23/2021&RollCallId=208
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=163
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/20/2021&RollCallId=324
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=05/24/2021&RollCallId=207
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=127

Bill Comments

feedback