PA HB831 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-13)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-19 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions relating to operation of vehicles, further providing for obedience to authorized persons directing traffic and providing for drivers in organized motorcycle processions; and, in rules of the road in general, further providing for following too closely.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions relating to operation of vehicles, further providing for obedience to authorized persons directing traffic and providing for drivers in organized motorcycle processions; and, in rules of the road in general, further providing for following too closely.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 831 PN 1840, FP (Y: 166 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 831 PN 1840, 2017 A1510, BULLOCK (Y: 60 N: 134 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A01437 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-19SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2017-06-30SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-30SenateReported as committed
2017-06-16SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-06-12SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (166-25)
2017-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-07HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-05HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-24HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-24HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-24HouseReported as amended
2017-03-30HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=831
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0831&pn=1178
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0831&pn=1840
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=05/24/2017&RollCallId=469
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=05/24/2017&RollCallId=470
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=441
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=463
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/12/2017&RollCallId=563
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=06/30/2017&RollCallId=376

Bill Comments

feedback