PA HB83 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 2, 1915 (P.L.736, No.338), known as the Workers' Compensation Act, in Uninsured Employers Guaranty Fund, further providing for claim petition.
Title
In Uninsured Employers Guaranty Fund, further providing for claim petition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-21 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-04 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-04 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |