PA HB829 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for dedication of portion of sales and use tax; and establishing the Tourism, Museum and Arts Trust Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for dedication of portion of sales and use tax; and establishing the Tourism, Museum and Arts Trust Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-10HouseLaid on the table
2021-11-10HouseRemoved from table
2021-09-15HouseLaid on the table
2021-09-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-08HouseRe-committed to RULES
2021-06-08HouseFirst consideration
2021-06-08HouseReported as committed
2021-03-08HouseReferred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback