PA HB829 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 7, 1961 (P.L.518, No.268), known as the Delaware River Basin Compact, in pollution control, further providing for enforcement; and, in general provisions, further providing for effect on riparian rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the act of July 7, 1961 (P.L.518, No.268), known as the Delaware River Basin Compact, in pollution control, further providing for enforcement; and, in general provisions, further providing for effect on riparian rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-14HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-26HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-26HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-26HouseReported as committed
2019-03-14HouseReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback