PA HB826 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for sports raffles for charity; and making related repeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for sports raffles for charity; and making related repeals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 826 PN 2085, CONCUR (Y: 194 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 826 PN 2085, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 826 PN 1491, FP (Y: 188 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Floor: HB 826 PN 1128, 2019 A670, CONKLIN (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Adopt Amendment A00507 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02HouseAct No. 56
2019-07-02HouseApproved by the Governor
2019-06-26HousePresented to the Governor
2019-06-26HouseSigned in Senate
2019-06-25HouseSigned in House
2019-06-25HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (194-7)
2019-06-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-25HouseReferred to RULES
2019-06-24HouseIn the House
2019-06-24SenateThird consideration and final passage (46-3)
2019-06-18SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-12SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-12SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-11SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-11SenateReported as amended
2019-05-03SenateReferred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
2019-04-29SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-29HouseThird consideration and final passage (188-9)
2019-04-29HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-17HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-17HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-04-16HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-27HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-27HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-27HouseReported as amended
2019-03-14HouseReferred to GAMING OVERSIGHT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=826
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0826&pn=0927
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0826&pn=1128
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0826&pn=1491
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0826&pn=2085
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=54&theDate=03/26/2019&RollCallId=204
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=54&theDate=03/26/2019&RollCallId=203
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=199
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=209
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=376
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=31&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=275
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=370
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=170
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=573
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/25/2019&RollCallId=923

Bill Comments

feedback