PA HB826 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 45 (Legal Notices) and 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, requiring executive orders to have a fiscal note; in effectiveness of documents, further providing for effective date of documents; in Independent Fiscal Office, requiring the Independent Fiscal Office to prepare fiscal notes for executive orders; and making an inconsistent repeal of certain provisions of The Administrative Code of 1929.
Title
In general provisions, requiring executive orders to have a fiscal note; in effectiveness of documents, further providing for effective date of documents; in Independent Fiscal Office, requiring the Independent Fiscal Office to prepare fiscal notes for executive orders; and making an inconsistent repeal of certain provisions of The Administrative Code of 1929.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 826 PN 1841, FP (Y: 111 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 826 PN 1841, MOT CONST, VITALI (Y: 113 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 826 PN 1841, 2015 A2267, PASHINSKI (Y: 80 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 826 PN 1841, 2015 A2266, DRISCOLL (Y: 80 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 826 PN 1841, 2015 A2264, SIMS (Y: 80 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 826 PN 1841, 2015 A2263, O'BRIEN (Y: 80 N: 114 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 826 PN 1841, 2015 A2262, NEUMAN (Y: 79 N: 116 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-06-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02215 (Y: 0 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-17 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02194 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00668 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00668 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02194 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02215 (Y: 0 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 826 PN 1841, FP (Y: 111 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 826 PN 1841, MOT CONST, VITALI (Y: 113 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 826 PN 1841, 2015 A2267, PASHINSKI (Y: 80 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 826 PN 1841, 2015 A2266, DRISCOLL (Y: 80 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 826 PN 1841, 2015 A2264, SIMS (Y: 80 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 826 PN 1841, 2015 A2263, O'BRIEN (Y: 80 N: 114 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 826 PN 1841, 2015 A2262, NEUMAN (Y: 79 N: 116 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-06-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02215 (Y: 0 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-17 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02194 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00668 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00668 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02194 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02215 (Y: 0 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-03-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2015-06-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-06-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (111-78) |
2015-06-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-22 | House | Second consideration |
2015-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-17 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-17 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-17 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |