PA HB825 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for a detoxification bed registry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for a detoxification bed registry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-24 - House - House Floor: HB 825 PN 2919, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Floor: HB 825 PN 909, 2017 A3636, HEFFLEY (Y: 182 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Floor: HB 825 PN 909, 2017 A2470, HEFFLEY (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-26SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2018-01-24SenateIn the Senate
2018-01-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (187-0)
2018-01-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-01-23HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-01-23HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-11-21HouseRemoved from table
2017-11-21HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-25HouseRemoved from table
2017-06-29HouseLaid on the table
2017-06-29HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-24HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-24HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-24HouseReported as committed
2017-03-13HouseReferred to HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=825
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0825&pn=0909
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0825&pn=2919
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=05/24/2017&RollCallId=459
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=968
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=969
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=01/23/2018&RollCallId=1228
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=985

Bill Comments

feedback