PA HB824 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-12)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for the National Guard Youth Challenge Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the National Guard Youth Challenge Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 824 PN 3661, CONCUR (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 824 PN 3661, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 824 PN 902, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28HouseAct No. 51
2018-06-28HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-06-21HousePresented to the Governor
2018-06-21HouseSigned in Senate
2018-06-20HouseSigned in House
2018-06-20HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (196-0)
2018-06-20HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-06-20HouseReferred to RULES
2018-06-19HouseIn the House
2018-06-19SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2018-06-11SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-06-06SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-07-17SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-07-17SenateSecond consideration
2017-07-08SenateFirst consideration
2017-07-08SenateReported as committed
2017-05-31SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2017-05-24SenateIn the Senate
2017-05-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2017-05-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-05-23HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-05-23HouseSecond consideration
2017-05-22HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-10HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-10HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-10HouseReported as committed
2017-03-10HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=824
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0824&pn=0902
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0824&pn=3661
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=05/10/2017&RollCallId=394
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=389
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/24/2017&RollCallId=454
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=07/08/2017&RollCallId=396
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/06/2018&RollCallId=905
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=563
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1366
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/20/2018&RollCallId=1792

Bill Comments

feedback