PA HB824 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in miscellaneous provisions, providing for confidentiality of personal information of public safety officials.
Title
In miscellaneous provisions, providing for confidentiality of personal information of public safety officials.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Petri [R] | Rep. William Kortz [D] | Sen. Frank Farry [R] | Sen. Steven Santarsiero [D] |
Rep. Nicholas Miccarelli [R] | Rep. Tina Davis [D] | Rep. Timothy Briggs [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-18 - House - House Floor: HB 824 PN 2678, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-12-18 - House - House Floor: HB 824 PN 2678, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, REED (Y: 185 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 824 PN 1565, 2015 A1916, O'BRIEN (Y: 174 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 824 PN 1565, 2015 A1917, HANNA (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 824 PN 1565, 2015 A5031, PETRI (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: To Table (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A00880 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A00880 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: To Table (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-18 - House - House Floor: HB 824 PN 2678, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-12-18 - House - House Floor: HB 824 PN 2678, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, REED (Y: 185 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 824 PN 1565, 2015 A1916, O'BRIEN (Y: 174 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 824 PN 1565, 2015 A1917, HANNA (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 824 PN 1565, 2015 A5031, PETRI (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: To Table (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A00880 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A00880 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: To Table (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2015-12-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-12-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2015-12-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-12-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-12-17 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-12-09 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-17 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-05 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-27 | House | Removed from table |
2015-06-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-01 | House | Removed from table |
2015-05-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-05-13 | House | First consideration |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |