PA HB823 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on October 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-22 - Act No. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on October 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-22 - Act No. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 25, 1945 (P.L.1050, No.394), known as the Local Tax Collection Law, further providing for bonds of tax collectors, for permanent basic and continuing education programs for tax collectors, for criminal history record information and for deputy tax collectors.
Title
Further providing for bonds of tax collectors, for permanent basic and continuing education programs for tax collectors, for criminal history record information and for deputy tax collectors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-05 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Floor: HB 823 PN 2181, CONCUR (Y: 193 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 823 PN 2181, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Floor: HB 823 PN 1586, FP (Y: 191 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Floor: HB 823 PN 1470, 2015 A1600, RADER (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A01195 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A01231 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A01219 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A01307 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A01195 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A01307 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A01219 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A01231 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - House - House Floor: HB 823 PN 2181, CONCUR (Y: 193 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 823 PN 2181, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Floor: HB 823 PN 1586, FP (Y: 191 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Floor: HB 823 PN 1470, 2015 A1600, RADER (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A01195 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A01231 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A01219 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A01307 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A01195 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A01307 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A01219 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A01231 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-22 | House | Act No. 48 |
2015-10-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2015-10-14 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2015-10-13 | House | Signed in Senate |
2015-10-05 | House | Signed in House |
2015-10-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (193-2) |
2015-10-05 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2015-09-30 | House | Referred to RULES |
2015-09-29 | House | In the House |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (45-2) |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-09-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-09-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Amended on second consideration |
2015-07-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-06-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-1) |
2015-06-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-05-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-05-13 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-05-12 | House | Removed from table |
2015-05-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-05-06 | House | First consideration |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |