PA HB810 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-29 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-29 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 64 (Public Authorities and Quasi-Public Corporations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Commonwealth Financing Authority, further providing for Second Stage Loan Program.
Title
In Commonwealth Financing Authority, further providing for Second Stage Loan Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 810 PN 963, FP (Y: 130 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 810 PN 963, FP (Y: 130 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2015-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (130-64) |
2015-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-23 | House | Second consideration |
2015-06-22 | House | Removed from table |
2015-06-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-09 | House | Removed from table |
2015-04-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-04-20 | House | First consideration |
2015-04-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |