PA HB807 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Pennsylvania National Guard, further providing for compensation of division commander or equivalent; and making a related repeal.
Title
In Pennsylvania National Guard, further providing for compensation of division commander or equivalent; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 807 PN 900, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Floor: HB 807 PN 900, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Floor: HB 807 PN 900, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Act No. 55 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2019-04-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-04-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2019-04-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-03-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-27 | House | Second consideration |
2019-03-26 | House | Removed from table |
2019-03-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-03-20 | House | First consideration |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |