PA HB800 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 60-4)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in educational tax credits, further providing for definitions and for limitations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In educational tax credits, further providing for definitions and for limitations.

Sponsors

Rep. Michael Turzai [R]Rep. David Millard [R]Rep. Michael Reese [R]Rep. David Hickernell [R]
Rep. Greg Rothman [R]Rep. Melinda Fee [R]Rep. Francis Ryan [R]Rep. Keith Greiner [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Pyle [R]Rep. Tina Pickett [R]Rep. David Zimmerman [R]Rep. Kerry Benninghoff [R]
Rep. Robert Kauffman [R]Rep. Ryan Warner [R]Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R]Rep. Craig Staats [R]
Rep. Curtis Sonney [R]Rep. Kurt Masser [R]Rep. Brett Miller [R]Rep. Lynda Schlegel Culver [R]
Rep. Justin Simmons [R]Rep. Ryan Mackenzie [R]Rep. Garth Everett [R]Rep. Paul Schemel [R]
Rep. Tedd Nesbit [R]Rep. John Lawrence [R]Rep. Jesse Topper [R]Rep. Thomas Sankey [R]
Rep. Frederick Keller [R]Rep. Steven Mentzer [R]Rep. Eric Nelson [R]Rep. Russ Diamond [R]
Rep. Michael Driscoll [D]Rep. Jonathan Fritz [R]Rep. Timothy Hennessey [R]Rep. David Maloney [R]
Rep. Seth Grove [R]Rep. Mark Rozzi [D]Rep. Stephen Barrar [R]Rep. Jeff Wheeland [R]
Rep. Stanley Saylor [R]Rep. Johnathan Hershey [R]Rep. Marcy Toepel [R]Rep. Matthew Gabler [R]
Rep. Louis Schmitt [R]Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D]Rep. Donna Oberlander [R]Rep. Michael Puskaric [R]
Rep. Barbara Gleim [R]Rep. Torren Ecker [R]Rep. Todd Polinchock [R]Rep. James Struzzi [R]
Rep. Lori Mizgorski [R]Rep. Joshua Kail [R]Rep. Robert Brooks [R]Rep. Michael Tobash [R]
Rep. Matthew Dowling [R]Rep. Mark Gillen [R]Rep. Valerie Gaydos [R]Rep. Andrew Lewis [R]
Rep. Tina Davis [D]Rep. Kathy Rapp [R]Rep. Mike Jones [R]Rep. David Rowe [R]

Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 800 PN 1676, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 800 PN 1676, FP (Y: 111 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 800 PN 964, 2019 A886, SAYLOR (Y: 138 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00826 (Y: 9 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19HouseBill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
2019-06-18HouseIn the House
2019-06-18SenateVeto No. 1
2019-06-18SenateVetoed by the Governor
2019-06-13SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-06-12SenateSigned in Senate
2019-06-12SenateSigned in House
2019-06-11SenateThird consideration and final passage (28-21)
2019-06-10SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-10SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-10SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-05SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-05SenateReported as committed
2019-05-17SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2019-05-07SenateIn the Senate
2019-05-07HouseFinal passage (111-85)
2019-05-06HouseThird consideration
2019-05-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-01HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-01HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-04-30HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-29HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-29HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-29HouseReported as committed
2019-03-18HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=800
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0800&pn=0964
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0800&pn=1676
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=364
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=365
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=227
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/06/2019&RollCallId=445
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=261
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=06/05/2019&RollCallId=230
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/10/2019&RollCallId=256
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=113

Bill Comments

feedback