PA HB800 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 58-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in educational tax credits, further providing for definitions and for limitations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In educational tax credits, further providing for definitions and for limitations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 800 PN 1676, FP (Y: 111 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 800 PN 964, 2019 A886, SAYLOR (Y: 138 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00826 (Y: 9 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2019-05-07SenateIn the Senate
2019-05-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (111-85)
2019-05-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-01HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-01HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-04-30HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-29HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-29HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-29HouseReported as committed
2019-03-18HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=800
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0800&pn=0964
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0800&pn=1676
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=364
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=365
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=227
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/06/2019&RollCallId=445
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=261

Bill Comments

feedback