PA HB775 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Presented to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of August 26, 1971 (P.L.351, No.91), known as the State Lottery Law, in pharmaceutical assistance for the elderly, further providing for income verification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In pharmaceutical assistance for the elderly, further providing for income verification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 775 PN 848, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Floor: HB 775 PN 848, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-08SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-04-07SenateSigned in Senate
2020-04-06SenateSigned in House
2020-04-06SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2020-01-28SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-10-22SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-10-22SenateSecond consideration
2019-09-23SenateFirst consideration
2019-09-23SenateReported as committed
2019-06-06SenateReferred to AGING AND YOUTH
2019-06-04SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-04HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-0)
2019-06-04HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-03HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-03HouseSecond consideration
2019-05-22HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-15HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-15HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-27HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-27HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-27HouseReported as committed
2019-03-11HouseReferred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=775
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0775&pn=0848
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=03/27/2019&RollCallId=212
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=350
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=609
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=1&theDate=09/23/2019&RollCallId=486
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=01/28/2020&RollCallId=723
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=416

Bill Comments

feedback