PA HB770 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on November 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-30 - Act No. 140
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on November 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-30 - Act No. 140
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of September 27, 1961 (P.L.1700, No.699), known as the Pharmacy Act, further providing for definitions; and providing for pharmacy technician and pharmacy technician trainee registration, qualifications and supervision, for pharmacy technician data entry and for laboratory waiver.
Title
Further providing for definitions; and providing for pharmacy technician and pharmacy technician trainee registration, qualifications and supervision, for pharmacy technician data entry and for laboratory waiver.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-19 - House - House Floor: HB 770 PN 4562, CONCUR (Y: 154 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 770 PN 4562, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 770 PN 4403, A7625, WARD, JUDY AMENDMENT NO. A-7625-RECONSIDERED (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 770 PN 4403, A7625, WARD, JUDY AMENDMENT NO. A-7625 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Floor: HB 770 PN 843, FP (Y: 163 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 770 PN 4562, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 770 PN 4403, A7625, WARD, JUDY AMENDMENT NO. A-7625-RECONSIDERED (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 770 PN 4403, A7625, WARD, JUDY AMENDMENT NO. A-7625 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Floor: HB 770 PN 843, FP (Y: 163 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-30 | House | Act No. 140 |
2020-11-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-11-20 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-11-19 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-11-19 | House | Signed in House |
2020-11-19 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (154-48) |
2020-10-21 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-10-20 | House | Referred to RULES |
2020-10-20 | House | In the House |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-1) |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-09-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2019-05-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-05-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (163-25) |
2019-05-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-14 | House | Second consideration |
2019-05-13 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-08 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |