PA HB770 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-20 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-20 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in preliminary provisions, further defining "eligible entity"; and, in licenses and regulations for liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for unlawful acts relative to liquor, malt and brewed beverages and licensees.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further defining "eligible entity"; and, in licenses and regulations for liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for unlawful acts relative to liquor, malt and brewed beverages and licensees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Floor: HB 770 PN 1526, FP (Y: 184 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Floor: HB 770 PN 1423, 2015 A1319, TAYLOR (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment #A01040 A01040 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment #A01040 A01040 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Floor: HB 770 PN 1526, FP (Y: 184 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Floor: HB 770 PN 1423, 2015 A1319, TAYLOR (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment #A01040 A01040 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment #A01040 A01040 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2015-05-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-05-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (184-10) |
2015-05-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-05-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-05-11 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-05-05 | House | Removed from table |
2015-05-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-05-04 | House | First consideration |
2015-05-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |