PA HB766 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, providing for COVID-19 emergency finance and tax provision; and in corporate net income tax, further providing for reports and payment of tax and for extension of time to file reports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In personal income tax, providing for COVID-19 emergency finance and tax provision; and in corporate net income tax, further providing for reports and payment of tax and for extension of time to file reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Floor: HB 766 PN 1156, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Floor: HB 766 PN 752, 2021 A659, GREINER (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09SenateReferred to FINANCE
2021-04-07SenateIn the Senate
2021-04-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-04-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-04-06HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-06HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-04-05HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-24HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-24HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-24HouseReported as committed
2021-03-03HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=766
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0766&pn=0752
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0766&pn=1156
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0766P1156.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=03/24/2021&RollCallId=226
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=126
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=142
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/07/2021&RollCallId=285

Bill Comments

feedback