PA HB764 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Act No. 12 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Act No. 12 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child protective services, further providing for employees having contact with children and adoptive and foster parents.
Title
In child protective services, further providing for employees having contact with children and adoptive and foster parents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 764 PN 2646, CONCUR (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 764 PN 2646, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 764 PN 1634, FP (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Floor: HB 764 PN 1416, 2021 A985, GLEIM (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A00676 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 764 PN 2646, CONCUR (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 764 PN 2646, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 764 PN 1634, FP (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Floor: HB 764 PN 1416, 2021 A985, GLEIM (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A00676 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Act No. 12 of 2022 |
2022-02-17 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-02-08 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-02-07 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-02-07 | House | Signed in House |
2022-02-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (200-0) |
2022-02-07 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-01-26 | House | In the House |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-10-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2021-06-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (203-0) |
2021-06-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-05-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-05-26 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-05-25 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-04 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |