PA HB763 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for authority to issue liquor licenses to hotels, restaurants and clubs, for sales by liquor licensees and restrictions, for sale of malt or brewed beverages by liquor licensees, for interlocking business prohibited, for retail dispensers' restrictions on purchases and sales, for unlawful acts relative to malt or brewed beverages and licensees, for unlawful acts relative to liquor, malt and brewed beverages and licensees and for premises to be vacated by patrons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for authority to issue liquor licenses to hotels, restaurants and clubs, for sales by liquor licensees and restrictions, for sale of malt or brewed beverages by liquor licensees, for interlocking business prohibited, for retail dispensers' restrictions on purchases and sales, for unlawful acts relative to malt or brewed beverages and licensees, for unlawful acts relative to liquor, malt and brewed beverages and licensees and for premises to be vacated by patrons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-05 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 763 PN 1328, FP (Y: 180 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A00667 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-19SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-10-06SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-10-06SenateSecond consideration
2020-10-05SenateFirst consideration
2020-10-05SenateReported as amended
2019-04-22SenateReferred to LAW AND JUSTICE
2019-04-15SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-15HouseThird consideration and final passage (180-16)
2019-04-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-10HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-10HouseSecond consideration
2019-04-09HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-08HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-08HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-08HouseReported as amended
2019-03-08HouseReferred to LIQUOR CONTROL

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=763
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0763&pn=0813
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0763&pn=1328
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0763&pn=4472
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=04/08/2019&RollCallId=227
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=04/08/2019&RollCallId=226
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=185
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/15/2019&RollCallId=271
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=29&theDate=10/05/2020&RollCallId=1179
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/19/2020&RollCallId=1238

Bill Comments

feedback