PA HB762 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for regulatory compliance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for regulatory compliance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 762 PN 812, FP (Y: 102 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateReferred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
2019-04-30SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-30HouseThird consideration and final passage (102-94)
2019-04-30HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-29HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-29HouseSecond consideration
2019-04-17HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-16HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-16HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-16HouseReported as committed
2019-03-08HouseReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback