PA HB760 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-21)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Third consideration and final passage (175-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating September 27 of each year as "First Responders Day."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating September 27 of each year as "First Responders Day."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 760 PN 861, FP (Y: 175 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (175-0)
2018-05-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-05-23HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-05-23HouseSecond consideration
2018-05-22HouseRemoved from table
2018-05-02HouseLaid on the table
2018-05-02HouseFirst consideration
2018-05-02HouseReported as committed
2017-03-10HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback