PA HB760 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-21)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating September 27 of each year as "First Responders Day."
Title
Designating September 27 of each year as "First Responders Day."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 760 PN 861, FP (Y: 175 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 760 PN 861, FP (Y: 175 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2018-05-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-05-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (175-0) |
2018-05-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-05-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-05-23 | House | Second consideration |
2018-05-22 | House | Removed from table |
2018-05-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-05-02 | House | First consideration |
2018-05-02 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |