PA HB755 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-8)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 3 (Agriculture) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in food protection, further providing for rules and regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In food protection, further providing for rules and regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Floor: HB 755 PN 914, FP (Y: 120 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00400 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09SenateReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
2021-04-06SenateIn the Senate
2021-04-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (120-81)
2021-04-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-04-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-05HouseSecond consideration
2021-03-22HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-15HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-15HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-15HouseReported as amended
2021-03-03HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=755
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0755&pn=0742
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0755&pn=0914
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0755P0914.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=03/15/2021&RollCallId=116
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=03/15/2021&RollCallId=117
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=130
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/06/2021&RollCallId=270

Bill Comments 750

feedback