PA HB753 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in offenses against the family, further providing for the offense of dealing in infant children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In offenses against the family, further providing for the offense of dealing in infant children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 753 PN 741, FP (Y: 196 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-28SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2021-05-25SenateIn the Senate
2021-05-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-5)
2021-05-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-05-24HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-05-24HouseSecond consideration
2021-05-05HouseRemoved from table
2021-04-20HouseLaid on the table
2021-04-20HouseFirst consideration
2021-04-20HouseReported as committed
2021-03-03HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback