PA HB753 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Passed on November 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-24 - Act No. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Passed on November 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-24 - Act No. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the Pennsylvania Long-term Care Council; providing for its powers and duties; and repealing related provisions of the Public Welfare Code.
Title
Establishing the Pennsylvania Long-term Care Council; providing for its powers and duties; and repealing related provisions of the Public Welfare Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 753 PN 1052, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 753 PN 1052, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00437 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00416 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00414 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00399 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00367 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00367 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00399 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00414 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00416 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00437 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 753 PN 1052, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00437 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00416 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00414 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00399 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00367 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00367 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00399 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00414 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00416 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00437 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-24 | Senate | Act No. 64 |
2015-11-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Signed in House |
2015-11-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-05-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2015-04-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2015-04-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-04-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-04-14 | House | Second consideration |
2015-04-13 | House | Removed from table |
2015-04-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-04-01 | House | First consideration |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |