PA HB752 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 49-10)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in educational tax credits, further providing for tax credits and for limitations.
Title
In educational tax credits, further providing for tax credits and for limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-18 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-18 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Floor: HB 752 PN 1473, FP (Y: 166 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Floor: HB 752 PN 888, 2015 A1214, SAYLOR (Y: 193 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00978 (Y: 1 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-04 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00978 (Y: 1 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-04 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Finance: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Finance: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-18 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Floor: HB 752 PN 1473, FP (Y: 166 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Floor: HB 752 PN 888, 2015 A1214, SAYLOR (Y: 193 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00978 (Y: 1 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-04 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00978 (Y: 1 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-04 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Finance: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Finance: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-12-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2015-05-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-05-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (166-26) |
2015-05-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-05-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-05-06 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-05-05 | House | Removed from table |
2015-05-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-05-04 | House | First consideration |
2015-05-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-04-21 | House | Re-referred to EDUCATION |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to EDUCATION |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred to FINANCE |