PA HB747 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Third consideration and final passage (117-84)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Commonwealth services, providing for retail store operations during declaration of disaster emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Commonwealth services, providing for retail store operations during declaration of disaster emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Floor: HB 747 PN 1018, FP (Y: 117 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A00543 (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (117-84)
2021-04-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-04-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-20HouseSecond consideration
2021-04-19HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-23HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-23HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-23HouseReported as amended
2021-03-03HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=747
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0747&pn=0732
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0747&pn=1018
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0747P1018.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=03/23/2021&RollCallId=217
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=03/23/2021&RollCallId=218
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=171
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/21/2021&RollCallId=349

Bill Comments

feedback