PA HB735 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on November 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-01 - Act No. 22 of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on November 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-01 - Act No. 22 of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in Commonwealth budget procedures, providing for scope and for
Title
In Commonwealth budget procedures, providing for scope and for
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-30 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-30 - House - House Floor: HB 735 PN 2210, CONCURRENCE (Y: 151 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 735 PN 2210, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 735 PN 2210, Motion to Suspend Rule 12 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 735 PN 1739, 2023 A2638, PITTMAN Amendment No. A-2638 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Adopt Amendment A01475 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 735 PN 684, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 166 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-30 - House - House Floor: HB 735 PN 2210, CONCURRENCE (Y: 151 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 735 PN 2210, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 735 PN 2210, Motion to Suspend Rule 12 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 735 PN 1739, 2023 A2638, PITTMAN Amendment No. A-2638 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Adopt Amendment A01475 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 735 PN 684, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 166 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-01 | House | Act No. 22 of 2023 |
2023-11-01 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2023-11-01 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2023-11-01 | House | Signed in Senate |
2023-10-30 | House | Signed in House |
2023-10-30 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (151-51) |
2023-10-30 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2023-10-30 | House | Referred to RULES |
2023-10-25 | House | In the House |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (50-0) |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-06-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2023-05-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-05-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (166-35) |
2023-05-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-04-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-04-26 | House | Second consideration |
2023-04-25 | House | Removed from table |
2023-04-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-04-24 | House | First consideration |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-03-28 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |