PA HB732 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in realty transfer tax, further providing for excluded transactions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In realty transfer tax, further providing for excluded transactions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-15HouseSecond consideration
2019-05-14HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-08HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-08HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-08HouseReported as committed
2019-03-18HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback