PA HB722 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-18)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill presented
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for the Legislative Reapportionment Commission for the purpose of reapportioning and redistricting the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for the Legislative Reapportionment Commission for the purpose of reapportioning and redistricting the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-11 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A06279 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House State Government: to postpone to April 17, 2018 (Y: 0 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14HouseResolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill presented
2017-05-08HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback