PA HB72 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 25, 1982 (P.L.633, No.181), known as the Regulatory Review Act, further providing for definitions, for proposed regulations and procedures for review and for final-form regulations and final-omitted regulations and procedures for review; providing for regulations deemed withdrawn; further providing for procedures for subsequent review of disapproved final-form or final-omitted regulations by the commission; and providing for concurrent resolution required for economically significant regulations.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for proposed regulations and procedures for review and for final-form regulations and final-omitted regulations and procedures for review; providing for regulations deemed withdrawn; further providing for procedures for subsequent review of disapproved final-form or final-omitted regulations by the commission; and providing for concurrent resolution required for economically significant regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Floor: HB 72 PN 48, FP (Y: 108 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Floor: HB 72 PN 48, FP (Y: 108 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS |
2021-05-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-05-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (108-93) |
2021-05-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-05-03 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-05-03 | House | Second consideration |
2021-04-21 | House | Removed from table |
2021-04-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-04-20 | House | First consideration |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |